+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB38-Orrock) (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1110H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 048256424-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 048256424-H1
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047147424
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2004: Incorporated by Tra. (HB38-Orrock) (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 3, 2004: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor