+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
On April 7, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 4/7/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1107ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022986668-H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 022986668-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 022986668-H1
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022937668
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor