+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0394)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1105ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16103519D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1105E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103519D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor