+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 3-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 8
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 10
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047149424
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2004: Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor