+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 64 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1101ER)
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024277792
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2002: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor