+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047151424
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 5, 2004: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor