+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 9, 2001 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
On May 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amd. (25-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (25-Y 4-N)
On May 9, 2001 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to accede to req. for conf. com. rej. (39-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: a Committee of Conference (39-Y 50-N)
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 57-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Senate sub. with amd. rejected by House (35-Y 57-N)
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reported from Finance with sub w/amd (14-Y 1-N)
- Rules suspended (34-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (34-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Reading of substitute with amendment waived
- Lt. Gov. ruled substitute /w amd. germane
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (28-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 4-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (32-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (32-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (28-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 3-N)
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. /w amd.
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 012987238-E
- Constitutional readings dispensed (89-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Passed House (84-Y 0-N 3-A)
On May 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (20-Y 0-N)
On May 2, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 012987238
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 012987238
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
May 9, 2001: VOTE: a Committee of Conference (39-Y 50-N)
May 9, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (25-Y 4-N)
May 8, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 57-N)
May 7, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (34-Y 0-N)
May 7, 2001: Reported from Finance with sub w/amd (14-Y 1-N)
May 7, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (32-Y 0-N)
May 7, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 3-N)
May 7, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 4-N)
May 4, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 0-N 3-A)
May 3, 2001: Reported from Appropriations with amds (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Phillip A. Hamilton
Type:
Primary Sponsor