+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1098ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1098H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104642D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104642D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 14102205D