+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 482 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1097ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD2962136 (HB1097H1)
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor