+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1095ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD5343813 (HB1095E)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor