+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1095ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102727D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2018: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 19, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor