+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1094ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute from Commerce and Labor agreed to 062776212-S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute from Commerce and Labor rejected 062776212-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute from Courts of Justice agreed to 064893820-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1094S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064893820-S2
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 062776212-S1
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1094H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062722212-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062722212-H1
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065680127