+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On April 6, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1094ER)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 024176648-E
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 15-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. Brink agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (17-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024176648