+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1093ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 063441500-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1093E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063441500