+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1091ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101814D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2012: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor