+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 12104863D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101988D
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor