+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (66)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1223 (effective 7/1/21)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1223)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1090ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (51-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: (51-Y 44-N)
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1090ER)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 20109532D-S3 (54-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 20109480D-S1 (Dunnavant)
- Floor substitute printed 20109525D-S2 (Chase)
- Floor substitute printed 20109532D-S3 ( Newman and Dunnavant)
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee amendment rejected
- Substitute by Senator Dunnavant withdrawn 20109480D-S1
- Substitute by Senator Chase withdrawn 20109525D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senators Newman and Dunnavant agreed to 20109532D-S3
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes Yes
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Chase rejected
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment HB1090S3
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 18-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N)
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106244D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1090H1
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
- Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106244D-H1
- Incorporates HB1489 (Hudson)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101515D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (51-Y 44-N)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N)
March 3, 2020: Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 18-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
January 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor