+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Transportation
On January 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Transportation
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On January 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 004559876-E
On September 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in Transportation (14-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (70-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 004559876-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (17-Y 6-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 004559876
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
September 15, 2000: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Transportation (14-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
February 6, 2000: Reported from Finance with amd (17-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor