+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1088ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1088E
- Printed as engrossed 18103797D-E
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N)
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103797D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor