+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1088ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 14102750D
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor