+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass in House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McDougle, Norment, Reeves
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Heretick, Knight, Davis
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107414D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107414D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1086S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107414D-S1
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1086E
- Printed as engrossed 18102817D-E
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102817D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor