+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 653 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1085ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 981171140-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 981171140