+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 459 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1084ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amendment by Mr. Hall agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 983089140-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983089140
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor