+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 308 (effective 1/1/15)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB108ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB108H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103935D-H1
- Read second time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14103935D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101849D
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor