+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1078ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor