+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Continued to 2017 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101322D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor