+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 103 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1077ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100912D
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor