+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
On April 4, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 289 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1076ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed