+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 641 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1076ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 16-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100599D
- Introduced by request
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2010: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
March 4, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor