+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (50-Y 49-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (50-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (50-Y 49-N)
- Rereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (17-Y 5-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101522D