+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1074ER)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967005300-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 967005300-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 967005300-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 961223300
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor