+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 21, 1998 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (40-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 59-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 986900811-H1
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1074ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (29-Y 10-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (26-Y 4-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 982740828-E
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (17-Y 4-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982740828
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions