+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 286 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1069ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101431D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor