+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 3-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 14102305D