+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1068ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 063546312-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1068E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063546312
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor