+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 883 (effective 7/1/02)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1066ER2)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1066ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 024874960-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 024874960-H1
On January 29, 2002 in the House:
- Substitute bill reprinted 024874960-H1
- Read first time
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 024874960-H1
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 025926960