+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (6-Y 9-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 23-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected
- Read second time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101695D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 2, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
January 30, 2012: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N)
January 26, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor