+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 23-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed LD4970450 (HB1061H1)NOT AGREED TO
- Engrossed by House
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (11-Y 9-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Agriculture (11-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor