+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0904)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 904 (effective 7/1/98)
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1060ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation # 1 (95-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation # 2 (29-Y 66-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (29-Y 66-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation #1 (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1060ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 2-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982194492-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982194492
- Referred to Committee on Education