+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1060ER)
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 165 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1060ER)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 965731244
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor