+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1060ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 22107613D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Cordoza, Batten, Hope
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Favola, Mason, Hanger
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 22106698D-S (1-Y 97-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106698D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1060S1
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106698D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101788D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 11, 2022: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 97-N)
February 22, 2022: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2022: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2022: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor