+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1059ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1059H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104717D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12104717D-H1
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102086D
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor