+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0398)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/16)
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1059ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1059H1
- Substitute by Delegate Bell, Robert B. agreed to 16105499D-H1
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed 16105499D-H1 (Bell, Robert B.)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102357D
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor