+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (76-Y 20-N 3-A)
- Passed House (76-Y 20-N 3-A)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 23-N 2-A)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104219D-H1
- Amendments # 1-4 and 6-9 by Delegate Ware rejected
- Amendments # 5 and 10 by Delegate Ware rejected
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1059H1
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104219D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 14103508D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2014: Continued to 2015 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N 2-A)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (76-Y 20-N 3-A)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor