+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
On April 6, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1058ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. (21-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to M., P. & P. S. sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 020002848
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2002: Reported from M., P. & P. S. (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor