+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
On April 2, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1057ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (20-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD3426298 (HB1057H1)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor