+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103005D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions