+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (10-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006100824-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. Rhodes agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (10-Y 9-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 006100824
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2000: Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (10-Y 4-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
February 1, 2000: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (10-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor