+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1055ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McDougle, Deeds, Peake
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Herring, Bell, Robert B., Collins
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107540D-S1 (1-Y 97-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107540D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1055S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 8-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107540D-S1
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106673D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1055H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106673D-H1
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103284D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice