+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Left in Commerce and Energy
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Referred from Public Safety by voice vote
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101536D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 8, 2022: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor